Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/25/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/15/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/15/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/13/2011