Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/13/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/16/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/01/2012