Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/04/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/01/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/03/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/21/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/06/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/25/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/19/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/04/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/06/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/27/2012