Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/03/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/03/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/03/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/03/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/15/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/21/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/24/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/19/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/19/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/26/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 09/15/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/20/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/22/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/29/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/03/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/15/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/28/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/06/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/18/2012