Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/28/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2012