Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 05/03/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/11/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/31/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/23/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/31/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/26/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/17/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/30/2012