Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/26/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/14/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 07/15/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 10/12/2011