Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/13/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/13/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/02/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/02/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/02/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/02/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 12/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2012