Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 04/14/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/15/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/01/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 06/16/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/24/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/15/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 09/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/15/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/15/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/15/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/04/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/30/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/20/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/24/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/01/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/09/2012
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/07/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 08/02/2012