Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/02/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/03/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/08/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/08/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/08/2012