Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/19/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/19/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 01/19/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/19/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/19/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/19/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/19/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/19/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/19/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 01/19/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/19/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 01/19/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/19/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/24/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/25/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/02/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/18/2011