Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/14/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/29/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/17/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/18/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/05/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/29/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/10/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/13/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/13/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/14/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2012