Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/03/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/03/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/03/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/03/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/03/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/03/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/21/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/29/2012