Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/04/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/04/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/04/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/04/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/05/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/13/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/13/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/25/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/13/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/13/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/13/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/16/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/23/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/08/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/08/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/08/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/26/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/26/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/26/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/27/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/27/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/29/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/29/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 08/01/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/26/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/26/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 08/26/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/09/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/09/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/09/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/23/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/23/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/23/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/23/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/23/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/06/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/06/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/16/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/05/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/05/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/05/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/05/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/12/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/13/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/23/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/09/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/28/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/01/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/19/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/31/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/27/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/11/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/23/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/24/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/24/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/24/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/25/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/12/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/09/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 11/09/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/13/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/27/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/30/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/30/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/03/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/12/2012
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 12/18/2012