Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/14/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/15/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 04/15/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/03/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/03/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/03/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/05/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/13/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/23/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/24/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/01/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/21/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/21/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/23/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/07/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/11/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/11/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/11/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/13/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 08/30/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 08/30/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/02/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/14/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/21/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/03/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/04/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 10/04/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/04/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/12/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/14/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 10/14/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 10/24/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/24/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/24/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 11/01/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/01/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/16/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/13/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 12/14/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/27/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/05/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/29/2012