Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/01/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/07/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/13/2012