Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/14/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/31/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/08/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/18/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/07/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/22/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/12/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/12/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/02/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 11/18/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/02/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/07/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/09/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/07/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/23/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/10/2012