Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/03/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/04/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/04/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/05/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/10/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/10/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/12/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/31/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/01/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/14/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/22/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/06/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/27/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/29/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/19/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/19/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/19/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/03/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/20/2011