Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/11/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/16/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/20/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/22/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012