Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/31/2012