Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/13/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/13/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/13/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/06/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/06/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/11/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/11/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/25/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 11/18/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/01/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 12/19/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/19/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/01/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/27/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 08/02/2012