Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 12/06/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/21/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/16/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/16/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/16/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/07/2012