Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/10/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/13/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/03/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/24/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/24/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/15/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/18/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/26/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/08/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 11/01/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/23/2012