Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/13/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/24/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/26/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/01/2012