Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/26/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/26/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/31/2012