Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/05/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/11/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/15/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/21/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/21/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/01/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/04/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/17/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/30/2012