Committees: H.R.1627 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/15/2011 Referred to
05/12/2011 Markup by
05/20/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-84
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs04/29/2011 Referred to
05/03/2011 Hearings by
05/05/2011 Markup by
05/05/2011 Reported by
House Armed Services04/15/2011 Referred to
05/20/2011 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel05/18/2011 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/24/2011 Referred to
07/18/2012 Discharged from