Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/13/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/13/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/13/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/13/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 05/13/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/13/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/13/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/13/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/13/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/01/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/01/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/23/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/21/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/23/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/23/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/23/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/11/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/11/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/11/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/14/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 11/01/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/17/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/18/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/06/2011