Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/21/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/11/2012