Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/04/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/02/2011