Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/23/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/13/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/14/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/20/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/07/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/20/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 09/20/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/22/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/22/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/03/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/03/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/07/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/07/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/07/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/07/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/07/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/11/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/13/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/13/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/24/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/24/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/26/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/27/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/27/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/27/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/27/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/14/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/16/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/17/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/18/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/23/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/10/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/05/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/21/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/29/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/18/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/07/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/10/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/30/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/18/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/28/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/29/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/10/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/18/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/23/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/23/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/01/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 08/01/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 09/10/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/13/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/13/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/29/2012