Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/25/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/12/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/01/2011