Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/21/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/11/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/02/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/15/2011