Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/13/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/21/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/12/2011