Committees: H.R.1667 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/02/2011 Referred to
04/06/2011 Hearings by
05/13/2011 Markup by
07/19/2011 Reported by House Report 112-93,Part 1
House Report 112-93,Part 2
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit05/02/2011 Referred to
03/16/2011 Hearings by
05/04/2011 Markup by
05/04/2011 Reported by