Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/04/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/04/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/04/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/13/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/13/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/24/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/31/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 08/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/30/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/30/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/07/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/12/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/21/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 10/04/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/04/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/04/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/12/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/25/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/30/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/07/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/23/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/17/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/17/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/27/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/05/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/09/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/09/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/13/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/16/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/30/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/05/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/06/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/20/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/12/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2012