Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/10/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 05/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/13/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/23/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/13/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/08/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/2011