Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/11/2012