Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 05/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 05/03/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 10/26/2011