Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/11/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/13/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/03/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/03/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/03/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/23/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/15/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/28/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/28/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/08/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/08/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/09/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/21/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/21/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/22/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/23/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/14/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/30/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/30/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/15/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/18/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/25/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/03/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/08/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/09/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/28/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/06/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/06/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/06/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/06/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/02/2012