Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/04/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/04/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/13/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/01/2012