There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Patient Empowerment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to establish a Medicare payment option for patients and physicians or practitioners to freely contract, without penalty, for Medicare fee-for-service items and services, while allowing Medicare beneficiaries to use their Medicare benefits.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/03/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/06/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/05/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/03/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/03/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/03/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 05/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/09/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/20/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/19/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 08/26/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 09/08/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/04/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 11/30/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/19/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/05/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/20/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/31/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/12/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 08/02/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/09/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/03/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/06/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/03/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/05/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1700. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/03/2011)

Medicare Patient Empowerment Act - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to allow any Medicare beneficiary to enter into a contract with a non-participating (as well as with a participating) physician or practitioner for any item or service covered by Medicare. Allows such beneficiaries to submit a claim for Medicare payment in the amount that would otherwise apply if the claim had been filed by a participating physician or practitioner in the payment area where the physician or practitioner covered by the contract resides.

Requires a Medicare beneficiary to agree in writing in such a contract to: (1) pay the physician or practitioner for a Medicare-covered item or service; and (2) submit (in lieu of the physician or practitioner) a claim for Medicare payment. Allows a beneficiary, however, to negotiate, as a term of the contract, for the physician or practitioner to file such claims on the beneficiary's behalf.

Preempts state laws from limiting the amount of charges for physician and practitioner services for which Medicare payment is made.