Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 05/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/09/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/20/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/19/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 08/26/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 09/08/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/04/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 11/30/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/19/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/05/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/20/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/31/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/12/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 08/02/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/09/2012