Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/03/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/26/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/12/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 08/01/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2012