Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/12/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/12/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 05/26/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/26/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/26/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/03/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/03/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/03/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/23/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/28/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/28/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/13/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/13/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/07/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/07/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/22/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/11/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/13/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/04/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/04/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/04/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/18/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/01/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/06/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/06/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/06/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/13/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/13/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/14/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/20/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/16/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/16/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/06/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/06/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/25/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/25/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/08/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/08/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/09/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/21/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/12/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/14/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/14/2012