There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Job Creation and Energy Security Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exempt sales of natural gas for use in natural gas vehicles from the retail sales limitation on defining independent producers of petroleum products.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/04/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/04/2011Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/04/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/05/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/05/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/11/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/11/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/11/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/11/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/11/2011
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/11/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/11/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/20/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/25/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/04/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1712.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1712. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/04/2011)

Job Creation and Energy Security Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exempt sales of natural gas, or any product derived from natural gas, for use in motor vehicles from the $5 million retail sales limitation applicable to independent producers of petroleum products for purposes of the oil and gas depreciation allowance.