Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/05/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/05/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/11/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/11/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/11/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/11/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/11/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/11/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/11/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/20/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/25/2012