Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/01/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/17/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/31/2012