Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/06/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/06/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 05/06/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/06/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/06/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/06/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/06/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/23/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 11/18/2011