Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/29/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/19/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/20/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/14/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/06/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/14/2012